HI SB1233 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates monies for a federal inspection station at Kona international airport.
Title
DOT; Kona International Airport; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 169) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to TRA, WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB610 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1233&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB1233_.HTM |