HI SB1237 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 088, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 088, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance providers that provide medicare advantage (medicare part C) health benefit plans to submit administrative data, including health care services claims and payment data, to the State Health Planning and Development Agency, or its designee. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | Act 088, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189). |
2019-06-12 | House | Act 088, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 140) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 140). |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, San Buenaventura, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 949). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, San Buenaventura, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Deferred one day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2100), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1443) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Thursday, 03-14-19 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 412) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 917) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 539) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1011 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 10