HI SB1264 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 160, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 160, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the process for registration, registration renewal, instruction, and training for security guards. Triennial registration period for security guards effective beginning on 6/30/2018. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Security Guards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 160, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261). |
2017-07-11 | House | Act 160, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 68) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 68). |
2017-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Takumi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kidani, Nishihara. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi Co-Chairs; Woodson, Ward. |
2017-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 514). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 394). |
2017-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Har, McKelvey, Oshiro excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-31 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-03-17. |
2017-03-31 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1554) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino. |
2017-03-28 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1296) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-03-15 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Wednesday, 03-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 373) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 704) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara, Ruderman. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 03-02-17 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1515 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).