HI SB1287 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the chief information officer to employ persons not subject to chapters 76, 78, and 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes; transfers the shared services technology special fund from the department of budget and finance to the department of accounting and general services, specifies a percentage from special funds for deposit into the fund, and establishes a trust account in the fund; authorizes the chief information officer and comptroller to raise funds and accept donations for the fund; requires the chief information officer to submit annual reports; appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Information Technology; Chief Information Officer; Shared Services Technology Special Fund; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 298) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 782) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 313) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-11-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1060 (Same As)