HI SB1304 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to PSM/HSH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to PSM/HSH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit of twenty-five per cent of the total cost, including installation, of an automatic fire sprinkler or automatic fire sprinkler system in any new detached one- or two-family dwelling unit in a structure used only for residential purposes. Sunsets on June 30, 2025.
Title
Fire Sprinklers; Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HSH, WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1242 (Same As) 2015-02-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1304&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB1304_.HTM |