HI SB1377 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Ocean, Marine Resources, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits spearfishing at all hours of the day within the Waikiki-Diamond Head shoreline fisheries management area. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Fisheries; Spearfishing Prohibition; Waikiki-Diamond Head Shoreline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on OMH/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Monday, 03-23-15 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 368) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kouchi . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 556) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-18-15 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to WTL/ENE. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |