HI SB1464 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1464
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain positions in the Department of the Attorney General and Judiciary responsible for the preparation, filing, defense, and adjudication of assisted community treatment petitions, related guardianship petitions, and other legal filings. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Judicial Proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1478), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2019-03-14 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 at 2:00pm. |
2019-03-12 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 493) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1130) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1464 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
Subjects
AG
Appropriations ($)
Assisted Community Treatment
Department of Health
JUD
Judicial Proceedings
Petitions
Appropriations ($)
Assisted Community Treatment
Department of Health
JUD
Judicial Proceedings
Petitions