HI SB156 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation for breast and cervical cancer screening to the department of health to reach more women who are eligible to be screened under the screening program.
Title
Breast and Cancer Screening; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 32) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 01-31-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=156 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB156_.HTM |