HI SB160 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an exemption from tort liability for the State and counties arising from lifeguard services, except for gross negligence or wanton acts or omissions.
Title
Relating To Tort Liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 621) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB178 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB160 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
SB160 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.