HI SB171 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the patients' bill of rights by prohibiting certain unfair or deceptive business practices by managed care plans, such as canceling, denying, or nonrenewing an enrollment or subscription because of a person's health status; prohibits rates for any individual that exceed 200% of the standard group rate.
Title
Patients' Bill of Rights; Health Insurance; Coverage; Rates
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN deferred the measure until 02-25-09 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-09 3:00pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) Re-Referred to HTH/CPN. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=171&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB171_.HTM |