HI SB193 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB193
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires publicly held domestic corporations to have a gender-diverse board of directors. Establishes reporting requirements for the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs and penalties. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Equitable Gender Representation On Corporate Boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 82) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 689) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 275) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1077 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB193 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21
SB193 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21