HI SB2079 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes penalties and fines for any person who knowingly captures, takes, possesses, abuses, or entangles any shark, whether alive or dead, or kills any shark, within state marine waters and makes it a misdemeanor. Expands the existing prohibition on knowingly capturing or killing a manta ray to all rays. Expands the prohibition regarding rays to cover knowingly capturing, taking, possessing, abusing, or entangling a ray, whether alive or dead, or killing a ray, within state marine waters. Provides certain exemptions. (SB2079 HD1)
Title
Related To Shark And Ray Protection.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5). |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1293-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, DeCoite, Creagan, Say, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Thielen. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 03-13-18 9:45AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 87) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2772) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WTL/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2490) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, L. Thielen. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WTL/JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |