HI SB2094 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends prohibition against certain individuals possessing or owning firearms to clarify that all individuals charged with a felony offense or convicted of certain offenses are prohibited from possessing a firearm.
Title
Relating To Firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 130). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2971) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1468 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1