HI SB2095 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an affirmative defense for anyone charged with unauthorized control of a propelled vehicle, where the defendant purchased the vehicle in good faith and believed themselves to be the actual owner of the vehicle.
Title
Relating To Unauthorized Control Of A Propelled Vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1469 (Same As) 2022-06-17 - Act 053, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1153).
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Honolulu Prosecuting Attorney's Office Package
Unauthorized Control of a Propelled Vehicle
Honolulu Prosecuting Attorney's Office Package
Unauthorized Control of a Propelled Vehicle
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2095&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2095_.HTM |