HI SB2113 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "beneficiary consultation". Prohibits the department of Hawaiian home lands from disposing or extending a general lease to non-beneficiaries, unless there are no applicants seeking to enter into a general lease for the use and occupancy of a tract of Hawaiian home lands. Requires the department to notify beneficiaries through beneficiary consultation prior to the disposition of Hawaiian home lands. Prohibits the department from establishing additional criteria to enter into a general lease with an applicant, under certain conditions. Specifies that the department may grant a license or enter into a general lease, under certain conditions. Allocates the interest or other earnings from the Hawaiian home loan fund and Hawaiian home general loan fund into their respective funds, under certain conditions. Requires the department to submit a quarterly report to the legislature and beneficiaries. Authorizes the department to negotiate with homestead association governed water agencies to maintain water systems prior to other service providers, under certain conditions. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Home Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2492) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN will hold a public decision making on 02-04-20 1:18PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |