HI SB2203 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a new part to chapter 209E that establishes health care enterprise zones to provide tax and loan incentives for primary care practitioners located in health care enterprise zones. Requires affected county to concur with the director of health when considering whether to designate an area within the county as a health care enterprise zone. Effective 7/1/50. (SD1)
Title
Health Care Enterprise Zones; Tax Incentives; Low-Interest Loans
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from HTH/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2307) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/EDT deferred the measure until 02-10-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to HTH/EDT, WAM. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |