HI SB2291 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows owners of condominium units in condominium structures no more than three stories in height to place a solar energy device on the roof above the condominium unit, subject to conditions. (SD1)
Title
Solar Energy Devices; Condominium Units
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2017) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Slom. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-12 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to ENE, CPN. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |