HI SB2307 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Re-Referred to CPH/PSM, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Re-Referred to CPH/PSM, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning January 1, 2017, establishes a licensing system for medical marijuana growing facilities, production centers, and retail dispensing locations. Allows persons authorized to use and possess medical marijuana in other states to be treated similarly to qualifying patients in this State pursuant to rules adopted by the department of health after 1/1/2018. Authorizes the department of health to conduct criminal history checks on license applicants; licensees; prospective employees of growing facilities, production centers, and retail dispensing locations; subcontractors; and persons authorized to enter and remain on such premises. Repeals chapter 329D on December 31, 2016.
Title
Medical Marijuana Dispensary Program; Operations; Licensing
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH/PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2307&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2307_.HTM |