HI SB2310 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-05 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-05 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Public Safety to work with county victim assistance offices to give notice of the escape of a prisoner who is a domestic violence offender to each victim of the domestic violence and individuals protected by a restraining order against the escapee, immediately following the escape by the most reasonable and expedient means available. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Prisoners; Escape; Domestic Violence; Restraining Order; Victim Rights; Notification
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Reported from PSM/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2067) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-14 2:45PM in conference room CR 224. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/HMS, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HMS. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |