HI SB2310 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person from using a location tracker to harass, stalk, or perpetuate a crime against another person without their knowledge. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Harassment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-13-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-01 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-02-29 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 20) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, McKelvey, San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-29-24. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2744) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 9:30AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2014 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 2