HI SB2329 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 040, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 040, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the examiner of drivers to waive the actual demonstration of ability to operate a motor vehicle for persons who have a valid provisional license from another state and who have completed the same requirements for a provisional license in Hawaii. (SB2329 HD1)
Title
Provisional and Drivers Licenses; Requirement Waivers; Out-of-State
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Act 040, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140). |
2014-04-25 | House | Act 040, on 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Taniguchi. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-14. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-10-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Deferred until 04-08-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Deferred until 04-04-14. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Deferred until 04-03-14. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 415). |
2014-04-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Hashem excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1375-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, Kawakami, Wooley, McDermott. |
2014-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-25-14 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima, Souki, Takai, Wooley excused (5). |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1073-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Takayama, Aquino, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing. |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-17-14 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 160) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2696) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-25-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from TIA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2348) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to TIA/PSM, JDL. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1773 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 3