HI SB2373 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a position and appropriates funds for a program named "project reset", which will help offenders secure post-release housing to support their reentry, rehabilitation, and employment. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Offender Reentry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Yamane, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ganaden, McDermott. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 467). |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1829-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1103-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHH. |
2022-03-16 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, McDermott. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to CMV, HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 202) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2930) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2080) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1650 (Same As) 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).