HI SB2384 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-05 - (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-05 - (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends little Davis-Bacon rights regarding prevailing wages to employees on service contracts with governmental contracting agencies.
Title
Service Contracts
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR/JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-10 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to LBR/JGO, WAM. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2100 (Same As) 2010-02-03 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2384&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2384_.HTM |