HI SB2384 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes theft of a computer, as defined in section 708-890, HRS, as theft in the second degree. (SD1)
Title
Theft; Computer
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2319) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Ihara, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to TEC, JDL. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2080 (Same As) 2014-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.