HI SB2384 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act 184, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1286).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act 184, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1286).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to: (1) conduct unannounced visits and inspections, including inspections for relicensing and recertification, for certain state-licensed or state-certified care facilities beginning on July 1, 2019, and unannounced inspections for license renewals for medical marijuana production centers and dispensaries beginning on July 1, 2016; and (2) submit reports to the legislature prior to the regular sessions of 2017, 2018, and 2019 on the number of visits and inspections by the department of health on the specified state-licensed or state-certified care facilities and general outcomes and corrective actions taken. (CD1)
Title
Licensing; State-licensed Care Facilities; State-certified Care Facilities; Marijuana Dispensaries; Unannounced Visits; Unannounced Inspections; Report
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Act 184, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1286). |
2016-07-01 | House | Act 184, on 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1286). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Johanson voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Ito, McDermott, Oshiro, Tupola, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Ing, Kawakami, Souki excused (3). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 152-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 152-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Rhoads, Nishimoto, Cachola, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 3:15pm in conference room 016. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Pouha replaced Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kidani, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Rhoads, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Cachola, McKelvey, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 530). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Ichiyama, Johanson, Kobayashi, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Morikawa, Onishi, Pouha, Tokioka, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Lowen, McDermott, San Buenaventura, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ing, Kawakami, Oshiro, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Deferred one day 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1616-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Jordan, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 04-05-16 at 2:30PM. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1278-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, McDermott. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Fukumoto Chang; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Tupola. |
2016-03-22 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/JUD on Wednesday, 03-23-16 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-11 | House | Re-referred to HLT/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 149) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Kim . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Ruderman). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) English, Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2513) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Nishihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |