HI SB2429 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Recommitted to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Recommitted to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a definition of "fantasy competition" and includes fantasy competition under the definition of "contest of chance". Takes effect on 1/1/2017. (SD1)
Title
Fantasy Competition; Contest of Chance; Penal Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Recommitted to JDL. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2524) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2111 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2