HI SB2429 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a security guard from possessing a firearm in the course of employment if the guard was discharged from employment as a law enforcement officer due to poor employment standing. Requires state and county law enforcement agencies to make appropriate disclosures. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Guards.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from PSM/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2449) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM/LBR, CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |