HI SB2446 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of education to name the new public high school in Kihei, Maui, the "Patsy Takemoto Mink High School" in honor of the late United States Representative Patsy Takemoto Mink. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Department of Education; Kihei High School; Representative Patsy Takemoto Mink
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 195) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2668) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2312) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-14 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2032 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3