HI SB2498 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows interest to be collected on unfunded settlements against the State, its officers, or its employees. (SD1)
Title
Interest; Claims Against the State; Legal Settlements
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2341) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-03-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |