HI SB2522 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 689).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 689).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Agriculture Accelerator Program (Program) to authorize the Agribusiness Development Corporation (ADC) to invest in existing or new agriculture businesses approved by the Board of Directors of ADC in return for equity in those agriculture businesses. Establishes an Agriculture Accelerator Special Fund to provide moneys that ADC may invest in agriculture businesses under the Program. (SB2522 HD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 689). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Nishihara. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Evans, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Ward. |
2018-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 555). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 410). |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) LoPresti, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1822-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from AGR/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1376-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Say. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Wednesday, 03-21-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 207) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kim . Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere, Ruderman, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2873) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, K. Kahele. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 10:45AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/ETT, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |