HI SB2522 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that claims against the State exceeding the amounts that may be paid by the comptroller shall be paid by the department or agency that is found liable for the claim, as determined by the Attorney General. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Claims Against The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2754) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-04-20 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |