HI SB257 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB257
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of land and natural resources to establish a public lands lease extension pilot project to extend certain leases of public lands for commercial, industrial, resort, mixed-use, or government use upon approval of a proposed development agreement to make substantial improvements to the existing improvements. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Lease Extensions On Public Land.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 183) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Nishihara, Rhoads, Riviere. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 947) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 1:35PM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 157) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 01-29-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |