HI SB2579 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the director of finance to issue general obligation bonds for the department of health to develop a secure inpatient psychiatric facility to serve the mentally ill who need stricter security and inmates and detainees who need a higher level of mental health care. Requires the department of health to establish a task force to study the needs of the populations served by the psychiatric facility and develop a coordinated interagency action plan to implement services at the new inpatient psychiatric facility. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Hawaii State Hospital; Inpatient Psychiatric Facility; Task Force; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 235) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2734) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2015) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-14 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |