HI SB269 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates matching funds to University of Hawaii school of medicine to train students to become physician assistants within a physician assistant program at the University of Hawaii John A. Burns school of medicine to address the medical needs of underserved communities within the State.
Title
Physician Assistant Program; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee on HRE-HTH deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE-HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-09 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to HRE/HTH, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=269&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB269_.HTM |