HI SB2732 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to WTL/CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to WTL/CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the introduction of fluoride to a public water system. Provides that any conflicting laws or rules are preempted.
Title
Relating To Safe Water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL/CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2480 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Re-referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 9
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2732&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2732_.HTM |