HI SB2776 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of directors of the high technology development corporation, in conjunction with the board of regents of the University of Hawaii, to create a film and media park. Designates certain properties to be included in the park. Appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2776 HD1)
Title
Economic Development; Creative Film and Media Park; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2). |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1059-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-14 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wooley. |
2014-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-14-14 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 287) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2802) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:25AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2262) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Chun Oakland, English; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Wakai. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-14 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2354 (Same As) 2014-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3).