HI SB2784 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 4:30PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 4:30PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes general fund appropriations of unspecified amounts for fiscal years 2011-2012 and 2012-2013 to recapitalize the Hawaii Hurricane Relief Fund. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB2784 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Hurricane Relief Fund; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 4:30PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 3:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 9:20AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-12 9:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-12 10:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-12 4:30PM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 757). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kidani, Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Oshiro Chair; Choy, M. Lee, Ward. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 495). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1533-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-03-31 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-02-12 5:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-12. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-30-12 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 307) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2626) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2104) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2522 (Same As) 2012-02-14 - (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.