HI SB2811 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement for the Department of Human Resources Development to submit annual reports to the Legislature regarding expenditures of qualified community rehabilitation programs.
Title
Qualified Community Rehabilitation Programs; Reports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1115-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Souki, Takumi, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Saiki. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-16-12 10:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 322). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) One Day Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2774) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2277) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 1:25PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2549 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 7