HI SB2819 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes electronic cigarettes in the definition of tobacco products that may not be sold to a minor. (SD1)
Title
Electronic Cigarettes; E-cigarettes; Sale; Minor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 325) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2432) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-10-12 11:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2557 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 7