HI SB2858 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows grandparents of a minor child to be awarded reasonable visitation rights when the child's parent is unable to exercise parental visitation. Sets forth procedures, considerations, and standards for the court to grant grandparent visiting rights. Specifies that a violation of the terms and conditions of the court order granting grandparent reasonable visiting rights is punishable as contempt of court. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Child Visitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2412) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |