HI SB2907 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Director of Labor and Industrial Relations to allow third-party inspectors and third-party inspection companies to conduct certain types of elevator inspections; effective July 1, 2020, repealed June 30, 2025.
Title
Relating To The Boiler And Elevator Safety Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2351 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2907&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2907_.HTM |