HI SB2911 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates references to customs and border protection service to reflect current names of agencies within the federal department of homeland security. Adds the federal bureau of investigations to and deletes the citizenship and immigration services from the list of federal agencies whose officers may make arrests for certain offenses under state law. Prohibits admission of evidence in state courts from warrantless arrest. (SD2)
Title
Power of Arrest; Federal Officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 37 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 310) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2612) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine, Bunda. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2192) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Bunda, Gabbard, Galuteria, Kidani, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 1:25pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to PSM, JGO. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Introduced. |