HI SB2911 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires procuring agencies to include in invitations for bids on construction contracts a listing of the licenses that are required to perform work under the contract.
Title
Competitive Sealed Bidding; Construction Contracts; Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee on EGH deferred the measure. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-14 3:20PM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EGH. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2383 (Same As) 2014-02-19 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2911&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2911_.HTM |