HI SB2946 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the attorney general, upon referral by the county police or county prosecuting attorney, to review or initiate a review of a criminal investigation conducted by the county police or county prosecuting attorney for the purpose of providing an independent review of such criminal investigations. Authorizes the attorney general to refer the review of criminal investigations to another party, as appropriate. Sets forth deadlines for the reviews.
Title
Relating To The Attorney General.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-06-18 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
County Prosecuting Attorneys
Criminal Investigations
Department of the Attorney General
Independent Review
United States Attorneys
Criminal Investigations
Department of the Attorney General
Independent Review
United States Attorneys
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2946&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2946_.HTM |