HI SB2973 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a general excise tax at the wholesale rate of one-half of one per cent for the gross proceeds or income from the sale of all products produced by Hawaiian loko ia. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
General Excise Tax; Loko Ia; Hawaiian Fishpond
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2172) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Inouye, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Slom. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Wakai. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WLA, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2458 (Same As) 2016-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.