HI SB2994 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an employer to seek a temporary restraining order and injunction against further harassment of an employee or invitee who may be harassed at the employer's premises or worksite.
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2120) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to LBR, JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2200 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - The committee on LBR deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2994&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2994_.HTM |