HI SB3049 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 201-13.8, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to allow the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to collect and analyze employer information and data. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Employer Information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2628) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EET, JDC. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2081 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - The committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.