HI SB392 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the interagency coordinating body for youth and family programs within the department of human services.
Title
Keiki Caucus; Department of Human Services; Interagency Coordinating Body for Youth and Family Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 01-29-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB394 (Same As) 2013-01-22 - Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3