HI SB392 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends income tax credit for low-income household renters to adjust for inflation. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2015.
Title
Women's Legislative Caucus Package; Income Tax Credit; Low-Income Household Renters
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-15 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 19) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB454 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=392&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB392_.HTM |