HI SB398 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB398
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of unauthorized control of a propelled vehicle in the second degree, which applies if a person recklessly or negligently exerts unauthorized control over another's propelled vehicle by operating the vehicle without the owner's consent or by changing the identity of the vehicle without the owner's consent.
Title
Relating To Offenses Against Property Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB398 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to JDC.
HB172 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Act 006, 04/14/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
HB172 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Act 006, 04/14/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=398&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB398_.HTM |